EP0741521 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE FOR MAKING ICE-CREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUKOSCHEK, Romuald Leander Dr. Franz Palla-Gasse 28/II/12 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 02 /
PRANDL, Reinhard Major Trojerstrasse 19 A-9170 Ferlach / AT | 03 /
SONNEK, Martin Schützenstrasse 44 A-9300 St. Veit/Glan / AT | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Hesselmann, Gerardus Johannes Maria, et al Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95930680.4 | 22.09.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995IB00783 | Priority number, date | AT19940001929 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: AT 192994 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611583 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741521 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741521 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/12 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
A23G9/12 (EP,US);
A23G9/228 (EP,US);
Y10S366/601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTGERÄT ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SPEISEEIS | [1996/46] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE FOR MAKING ICE-CREAM | [1996/46] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTROMENAGER UTILISE POUR FABRIQUER DE LA CREME GLACEE | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.12.2001 | FR | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | DE | 20.03.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
FR | 19.12.2001 | ||
DE | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 19.12.2001 | |
DE | 20.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 19.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3400572 (CAVALLI ALFREDO [IT]); | [A]DE3544671 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG); | [A]US4696166 (BUKOSCHEK ROMUALD L [AT], et al) |