EP0789874 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING NON-COMPUTER SYSTEM DEVICES BY MANIPULATING A GRAPHICAL REPRESENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDIALINK TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION Suite 300 18 West Mercer Street Seattle WA 98119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states MEDIALINK TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION Suite 300 18 West Mercer Street Seattle WA 98119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARMAN, David, J. 10211 N.E. Roberts Road Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 02 /
LACAS, Mark, A. The Loft 2320 First Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | 03 /
COCO, Geoffrey, P. 2515 Fourth Avenue Seattle, WA 98121 / US | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Spall, Christopher John BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95930855.2 | 17.08.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995US10527 | Priority number, date | US19940334416 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: US 334416 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614618 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789874 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789874 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
G06F8/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR STEUERUNG VON NON-RECHNER-SYSTEMEINRICHTUNGEN DURCH MANIPULIEREN EINER GRAPHISCHEN OBERFLÄCHE | [1998/43] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING NON-COMPUTER SYSTEM DEVICES BY MANIPULATING A GRAPHICAL REPRESENTATION | [1997/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'APPAREILS ET SYSTEMES NON INFORMATIQUES PAR MANIPULATION D'UNE REPRESENTATION GRAPHIQUE | [1997/34] |
Former [1997/34] | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM KONTROLLIEREN VON NON-RECHNER-SYSTEMEINRICHTUNGEN DURCH MANIPULIEREN EINER GRAPHISCHEN DARSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 18.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99104744.0 / EP0933700 | EP99104745.7 / EP0921463 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1999 | BE | 13.10.1999 | CH | 13.10.1999 | ES | 13.10.1999 | GR | 13.10.1999 | IT | 13.10.1999 | LI | 13.10.1999 | NL | 13.10.1999 | SE | 13.10.1999 | DK | 13.01.2000 | PT | 13.01.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
ES | 13.10.1999 | ||
GR | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
NL | 13.10.1999 | ||
SE | 13.10.1999 | ||
DK | 13.01.2000 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
ES | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
NL | 13.10.1999 | ||
SE | 13.10.1999 | ||
DK | 13.01.2000 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
ES | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
NL | 13.10.1999 | ||
SE | 13.10.1999 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
ES | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
SE | 13.10.1999 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
SE | 13.10.1999 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
CH | 13.10.1999 | ||
LI | 13.10.1999 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 13.10.1999 | |
BE | 13.10.1999 | ||
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
CH | 18.01.2000 | ||
LI | 18.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 13.10.1999 | |
PT | 13.01.2000 | ||
CH | 18.01.2000 | ||
LI | 18.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 13.10.1999 | |
PT | 13.01.2000 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4849880 (BHASKAR KASI S [US], et al) [X] 1-60 * column 2, line 34 - line 59 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 19 ** figure 1 *; | [X]EP0596594 (FIRSTPERSON INC [US]) [X] 1-60 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 13 * * figure 1 * |