EP0784553 - HYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL ELECTROVALVE AND ITS USE IN BRAKING CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Systemes de Freinage 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [1997/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHON, Jean, Pierre 19, rue des Sources F-77178 Saint-Pathus / FR | 02 /
MULLER, Philippe 76, avenue de Verdun F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | 03 /
AUDRAIN, Patrick 68 bis, 6ème Avenue F-93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | 04 /
BOURLON, Philippe 62, avenue de la République F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Bentz, Jean-Paul BOSCH SYSTEMES DE FREINAGE, 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 95931267.9 | 20.09.1995 | [1997/30] | WO1995FR01205 | Priority number, date | FR19940012185 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: FR 9412185 | [1997/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611828 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784553 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784553 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/36, B60T8/26, G05D16/20 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
B60T8/367 (EP,US);
B60T8/3665 (EP,US);
G05D16/2066 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/30] | Title | German: | ELEKTROVENTIL FÜR HYDRAULISCHE DRUCKREGELUNG UND ANWENDUNG IN BREMSANLAGEN | [1997/30] | English: | HYDRAULIC PRESSURE CONTROL ELECTROVALVE AND ITS USE IN BRAKING CIRCUITS | [1997/30] | French: | ELECTROVALVE DE REGULATION DE PRESSION HYDRAULIQUE ET APPLICATION AUX CIRCUITS DE FREINAGE | [1997/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3412351 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 7, line 29 - page 11, line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]US4940295 (ADACHI YOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 60 - column 8, line 30; figures 1A,1B,8 *; | [A]DE4036940 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 66 - column 9, line 8; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0452174 (BENDIX EUROP SERVICES TECH [FR]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4122282 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 15 - column 5, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9315939 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1* page 4, line 9 - page 9, line 9; figures 1-3 * |