04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
26.10.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
21.10.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
05.11.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.12.1999 [1999/51] |
05.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.11.1998 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
06.11.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
05.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.06.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.06.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
10.06.1998 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
26.03.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
29.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.07.1997 |
First examination report |
|
23.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |
09.05.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |
10.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.03.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|