Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3525895 | Global Dossier | 27.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | GB9502117 | 06.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0779979 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1999 | B1 | EP0779979 | 25.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | GB9502117 | 06.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE188035T | 15.01.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | GB9502117 | 06.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69514109T | 06.07.2000 | T2 | DE69514109D1 | 27.01.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | GB9502117 | 06.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5928609 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | GB9502117 | 06.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9607901 | Global Dossier | 14.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9417913D0 | 26.10.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9417913 | 06.09.1994 |