EP0734817 - HAND-HELD OPERATING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1999 [1999/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIMA, Mikio, c/o K.K. Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95931438.6 | 19.09.1995 | [1996/40] | WO1995JP01862 | Priority number, date | JP19940251406 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: JP 25140694 | [1996/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9609147 | Date: | 28.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0734817 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734817 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B25J13/02 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B25J13/02 (EP,US);
B25J19/06 (KR);
H01H9/0214 (EP,US);
H01H13/506 (EP,US);
H01H2217/048 (EP,US);
H01H2225/008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/40] | B25J19/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | HANDBEDIENGERÄT | [1996/40] | English: | HAND-HELD OPERATING UNIT | [1996/40] | French: | UNITE PORTATIVE DE COMMANDE | [1996/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1996 | Translation filed | 19.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 19.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH06134685 (YASKAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPH03190688 (FANUC LTD) |