EP0775211 - FUMONISIN DETOXIFICATION ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 800 Capital Square, 400 Locust Street Des Moines, Iowa 50309 / US | ||
Former [1997/22] | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 700 Capital Square 400 Locust Street Des Moines Iowa 50309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUVICK, Jonathan 1707 38th Street Des Moines, IA 50310 / US | 02 /
ROOD, Tracy, A. 4333 Allison Avenue Des Moines, IA 50310 / US | 03 /
Wang, Xun 129 D University Village, Ames Iowa 50010, Story County, Iowa / US | 04 /
Maddox, Joyce Rose 1707 38th Street, Des Moines Iowa 50310 / US | [1997/28] |
Former [1997/22] | 01 /
DUVICK, Jonathan 1707 38th Street Des Moines, IA 50310 / US | ||
02 /
ROOD, Tracy, A. 4333 Allison Avenue Des Moines, IA 50310 / US | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1997/22] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95931521.9 | 11.08.1995 | [1997/22] | WO1995US10284 | Priority number, date | US19940289595 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: US 289595 | US19950484815 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 484815 | [1997/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9606175 | Date: | 29.02.1996 | [1996/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0775211 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.02.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0775211 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/55, A01N63/02, A01H5/00, C12N1/21 | [1997/22] | CPC: |
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C12N15/8209 (EP,US);
C12N15/8242 (EP,US);
C12N15/8282 (EP,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,US);
C12N9/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/22] | Title | German: | FUMONISIN ENTGIFTENDE ENZYME | [1999/38] | English: | FUMONISIN DETOXIFICATION ENZYMES | [1997/22] | French: | ENZYMES DE DETOXICATION DES FUMONISINES | [1997/22] |
Former [1997/22] | FUMONSINENTGIFTENDE ENZYME | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/22] | 25.01.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99116039.1 / EP0981953 | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Cited in | International search | [DA] - R.F. VESONDER ET AL.;, "Comparative phytotoxicity of the fumonisins, AAL-toxin and yeast sphingolipids in Lemma minor L. (Duckweed)", ARCH. ENVIRON. CONTAM. TOXICOL., vol. 23, pages 464 - 467 [DA] 1 * see abstract and Figure 1. * | [A] - P.V. BÜNZ ET AL.;, "Purification of two isofunctional hydrolases (EC 3.7.1.8) in the degradative pathway for dibenzufuran in Sphingomonas sp. strain RW1", BIODEGRADATION, vol. 4, pages 171 - 178 [A] 1 * see abstract. * | [A] - J.P. DUVICK ET AL.;, "Purification and characterization of a novel antimicrobial peptide from maize (Zea mays L.) kernels", J. BIOL. CHEM., vol. 267, pages 18814 - 18820 [A] 1 * see abstract. * |