EP0779801 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A POCKET CUFF WITH A GLUTEAL GROOVE SPACER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREIER, Kimberly, Ann 9228 Axminster Drive Cincinnati, OH 45251 / US | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Uwe T. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1997/26] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 95931686.0 | 01.09.1995 | [1997/26] | WO1995US11171 | Priority number, date | US19940302291 | 08.09.1994 Original published format: US 302291 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9607381 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0779801 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0779801 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/49413 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/495 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/26] | Title | German: | DICHTUNGSBEHÄLTER, FÜR ABSORBIERENDE ARTIKEL, MIT EINEM AM GESÄSSEINSCHNITT ANGEBRACHTEN ABSTANDSHALTER | [1997/26] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE HAVING A POCKET CUFF WITH A GLUTEAL GROOVE SPACER | [1997/26] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPORTANT UNE POCHE FRONCEE POURVUE D'UN SEPARATEUR SE PLACANT CONTRE LE SILLON INTERFESSIER | [2000/09] |
Former [1997/26] | ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPORTANT UNE POCHE FRONCEE POURVUE D'UN SEPARATEUR SE PLA ANT CONTRE LE SILLON INTERFESSIER | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1997 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 01.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2000 | DK | 20.03.2001 | PT | 20.03.2001 | GR | 23.03.2001 | LU | 01.09.2001 | IE | 03.09.2001 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
GR | 23.03.2001 | ||
IE | 03.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
DK | 20.03.2001 | ||
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
IE | 03.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/48] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
IE | 03.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 20.12.2000 | |
PT | 20.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 20.12.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0357298 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 19; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9014063 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 6; figure -; claim - *; | [DY]US5171236 (DREIER KIMBERLY A [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,4,6 * column 12, line 33 - line 54; figure - *; | [DY]US5176672 (BRUEMMER MARY A [US], et al) [DY] 1,2,4,6 * column W *; | [PA]WO9500089 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1,2,4,6* page 20, line 17 - page 21, line 18; figure 9 *; | [DPA]US5397318 (DREIER KIMBERLY A [US]) [DPA] 1,7,8 * column W * |