22.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
11.10.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
25.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] |
26.10.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
28.07.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
03.11.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.05.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.01.2000 |
Change - French title |
published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] |
14.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.08.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.01.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.08.1998 |
First examination report |
|
27.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.06.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] |
09.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |
09.05.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] |
27.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.03.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|