Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3459257B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2003 | B2 | JPH10504987 | 19.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3502695 | Global Dossier | 27.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0779801 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2000 | B1 | EP0779801 | 25.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE198139T | 15.01.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2198858 | 16.04.2002 | C | CA2198858 | 14.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69519676T | 02.08.2001 | T2 | DE69519676D1 | 25.01.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100203655B | 15.06.1999 | B1 | KR970705364 | 09.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9701787 | 31.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | US9511171 | 01.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9607381 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1996 | A3 | WO9607381 | 14.03.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2152425T | 01.02.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5558660 | 24.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US30229194 | 08.09.1994 |