EP0799414 - COUNTERFLOW SNIFFING LEAK INDICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/41] | COUNTERFLOW SNIFTING LEAK INDICATOR | ||
[2000/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Balzers und Leybold Deutschland Holding Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25 63450 Hanau / DE | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖHM, Thomas Elsenbornerstrasse 24 D-50933 Köln / DE | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 50859 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95932019.3 | 09.09.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995EP03554 | Priority number, date | DE19944445829 | 22.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4445829 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619721 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799414 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799414 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/20 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
G01M3/205 (EP,US);
G01M3/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/41] | Title | German: | GEGENSTROM-SCHNÜFFELLECKSUCHER | [1997/41] | English: | COUNTERFLOW SNIFFING LEAK INDICATOR | [2000/40] | French: | DETECTEUR DE FUITES RENIFLEUR A CONTRE-COURANT | [1997/41] |
Former [1997/41] | COUNTERFLOW SNIFTING LEAK INDICATOR | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 30.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5301537 (ATKINSON JOHN A [CA]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 34 - line 52; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0242684 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 5 * column 6, line 13 - line 22; figure 3 *; | [DA]FR2283431 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |