EP0781156 - METHOD OF AIR FILTRATION FOR FIRE FIGHTER EMERGENCY SMOKE INHALATION PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIFEPRO, INC. Suite 1200, 1645 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard West Palm Beach, FL 33401 / US | [1997/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Dennis 50 Hidden Cove Court Southampton, NY 11968 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Karen 804 Silverleaf Court Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410 / US | 03 /
MORTON, Frances G., Apartment L08 100 Lakeshore Drive North Palm Beach, FL 33408 / US | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Pochart, François Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Pochart, François Cabinet Hirsch, 34, rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95932365.0 | 31.08.1995 | [1997/27] | WO1995US11090 | Priority number, date | US19940299926 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: US 299926 | US19950379339 | 27.01.1995 Original published format: US 379339 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9606658 | Date: | 07.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0781156 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0781156 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A62B9/00, A62B18/08, A62B25/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
A62B23/02 (EP,US);
A62B18/088 (EP,US);
A62B25/00 (EP,US);
A62B9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/27] | A62B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/27] | Extension states | LT | 01.04.1997 | LV | 01.04.1997 | SI | 01.04.1997 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM DIREKTEN SCHUTZ GEGEN EINATMUNG VON RAUCH | [1997/27] | English: | METHOD OF AIR FILTRATION FOR FIRE FIGHTER EMERGENCY SMOKE INHALATION PROTECTION | [1997/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE PROTECTION D'URGENCE CONTRE L'INHALATION DE FUMEE | [1997/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 01.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 04.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Request for further processing for: | 15.02.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2003 | BE | 10.12.2003 | CH | 10.12.2003 | IT | 10.12.2003 | LI | 10.12.2003 | NL | 10.12.2003 | DK | 10.03.2004 | GR | 10.03.2004 | SE | 10.03.2004 | ES | 21.03.2004 | PT | 10.05.2004 | IE | 31.08.2004 | LU | 31.08.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/16] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.08.2004 | ||
LU | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
IE | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
DK | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
BE | 10.12.2003 | ||
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
ES | 21.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
CH | 10.12.2003 | ||
LI | 10.12.2003 | ||
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
GR | 10.03.2004 | ||
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.12.2003 | |
SE | 10.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 10.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4154235 (WARNCKE ERNST [DE]); | [Y]GB2223683 (SABRE SAFETY LTD [GB]); | [Y]US4926854 (BODE SVEN [DE]); | [Y]US5291880 (ALMOVIST HANS O [US], et al) | [Y] - LAB SAFETY SUPPLY 1994, GENERAL CATALOG, Winter/Spring Edition, 1994, page 158, Number WB-3193. | Examination | US3202150 | WO9108148 |