blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0779928

EP0779928 - USE OF AN ACETOHYDROACID SYNTHASE PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF INTRODUCED GENES IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/26]ACETOHYDROACID SYNTHASE PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF INTRODUCED GENES IN PLANTS
[2004/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2005/12]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2001/45]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1997/26]For all designated states
American Cyanamid Company
Five Giralda Farms
Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DIETRICH, Gabriele
Flora Laan 3
NL-1405 AT Bussum / NL
02 / SMITH, Jane
12826 S.E. 2nd Street
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
03 / PENG, Jianying
19 Easton Court
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US
[1997/26]
Representative(s)Fitzner, Ulrich, et al
Fitzner & Frese PartGmbH
Rechtsanwalt - Patentanwälte
Hauser Ring 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]Fitzner, Ulrich, Dr., et al
Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10
40878 Ratingen / DE
Former [2000/44]Langfinger, Klaus Dieter, et al
Director Patents & Licensing, BASF Aktiengesellschaft ZDX/P-C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1997/26]Mannion, Sally Kim, Dr., et al
c/o Wyeth Laboratories, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date95932390.805.09.1995
[1997/26]
WO1995US11199
Priority number, dateUS1994030326608.09.1994         Original published format: US 303266
[1997/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9607746
Date:14.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0779928
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0779928
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.03.1996
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/82, C12N15/60, C12N5/10, A01H5/00
[1997/26]
CPC:
C12N15/8209 (EP,KR,US); C12N15/8216 (EP,US); C12N15/8222 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/26]
Extension statesLT05.03.1997
LV05.03.1997
SI05.03.1997
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES ACETOHYDROXYSÄURE-SYNTHASE-PROMOTERS ZUR EXPRESSION VON EINGEFÜHRTEN GENEN IN PFLANZEN[2004/42]
English:USE OF AN ACETOHYDROACID SYNTHASE PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF INTRODUCED GENES IN PLANTS[2004/42]
French:UTILISATION D'UN PROMOTEUR DE L'ACETOHYDROXYACIDE-SYNTHASE (AHAS) SERVANT A L'EXPRESSION DE GENES INTRODUITS DANS DES VEGETAUX[2004/42]
Former [1997/26]ACETOHYDROXYSÄURE-SYNTHASE-PROMOTER ZUR EXPRESSION VON EINGEFÜHRTEN GENEN IN PFLANZEN
Former [1997/26]ACETOHYDROACID SYNTHASE PROMOTER FOR EXPRESSION OF INTRODUCED GENES IN PLANTS
Former [1997/26]PROMOTEUR DE L'ACETOHYDROXYACIDE-SYNTHASE (AHAS) SERVANT A L'EXPRESSION DE GENES INTRODUITS DANS DES VEGETAUX
Entry into regional phase05.03.1997National basic fee paid 
05.03.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1996Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.03.1997Examination requested  [1997/26]
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2005Fee for grant paid
20.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
IE05.09.2005
PT07.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
[2007/16]
Former [2006/40]DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
IE05.09.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/14]DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/13]DK23.06.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0360750  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [X]US5013659  (BEDBROOK JOHN R [US], et al);
 [XY]EP0461355  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]);
 [A]WO9208794  (ICI PLC [GB]);
 [X]EP0492113  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]);
 [XY]EP0525384  (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.