EP0786133 - SYNCHRONOUS DETECTION OF CONCURRENT SERVO BURSTS FOR FINE HEAD POSITION IN DISK DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 501 Sycamore Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2001/34] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHER, Kevin, D. 3428 South Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
FITZPATRICK, Jim 280 Carmelita Drive Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
CHE, Xiadong 1120 Kensington Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95932403.9 | 08.09.1995 | [1997/31] | WO1995US11252 | Priority number, date | US19940320540 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: US 320540 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611470 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786133 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0786133 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/596 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
G11B5/59655 (EP,US);
G11B5/596 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/31] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONE DETEKTION VON KONKURRIERENDEN SERVOBURSTS ZUR KOPFFEINPOSITIONIERUNG IN PLATTENANTRIEB | [1997/31] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS DETECTION OF CONCURRENT SERVO BURSTS FOR FINE HEAD POSITION IN DISK DRIVE | [1997/31] | French: | DETECTION SYNCHRONE DE SERVOSALVES EN VUE DU POSITIONNEMENT FIN DE LA TETE D'UNE UNITE DE DISQUE | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 19.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5343340 (BOUTAGHOU ZINE-EDDINE [US], et al) [A] 1,4,12,15,24 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 51; figure - *; | [A]US5260703 (NGUYEN HUNG C [US], et al) [A] 1,4,12,15,24 * column 6, line 3 - column 14, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US4669004 (MOON RONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1,4,12,15,24 * column 7, line 16 - column 31, line 5; figure - * | International search | [Y]US5089757 (WILSON ROSSER S [US]); | [Y]US5341249 (ABBOTT WILLIAM L [US], et al); | [Y]US5136439 (WEISPFENNING GERALD L [US], et al); | [A]US4511938 (BETTS ALAN J [GB]); | [AP]US5384671 (FISHER KEVIN D [US]); | [A]US5301072 (WILSON ROSSER S [US]) |