EP0784873 - A NICKEL METAL HYDRIDE BATTERY CONTAINING A MODIFIED DISORDERED MULTIPHASE NICKEL ALUMINUM BASED POSITIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ovonic Battery Company, Inc. 1707 Northwood Dr. Troy, MI 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states OVONIC BATTERY COMPANY, INC. 1707 Northwood Troy, MI 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVSHINSKY, Stanford R. 2700 Squirrel Road Bloomfield Hills, MI 48013 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Rosa T. 1490 Brentwood Troy, MI 48098 / US | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 95932411.2 | 08.09.1995 | [1997/30] | WO1995US11278 | Priority number, date | US19940308764 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: US 308764 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9609657 | Date: | 28.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784873 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/32, H01M4/48, H01M4/52 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
H01M4/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/345 (EP,US);
H01M4/28 (EP,US);
H01M4/32 (EP,US);
H01M4/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/30] | Title | German: | NICKEL-METALL-HYDRID-BATTERIE MIT POSITIVER, MODIFIZIERTER, UNGEORDNETER, MULTIPHASEN NICKEL-ALUMINIUM-ELEKTRODE | [1997/30] | English: | A NICKEL METAL HYDRIDE BATTERY CONTAINING A MODIFIED DISORDERED MULTIPHASE NICKEL ALUMINUM BASED POSITIVE ELECTRODE | [1997/30] | French: | BATTERIE D'HYDRURE DE NICKEL METAL COMPORTANT UNE ELECTRODE POSITIVE A BASE DE NICKEL-ALUMINIUM MULTIPHASE MODIFIE OBTENUE DE MANIERE DESORDONNEE | [1997/30] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 19.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 29.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4844999 (OSHITANI MASAHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US4623597 (SAPRU KRISHNA [US], et al); | [AP]US5348822 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al); | [A]US4536259 (ODA YOSHIO [JP], et al) | [X] - JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, 34, (1991), WINSEL et al., "New Apparatus for the Measurement of the Self-discharge of the Nickel Hydroxide Electrode", pages 331-338. | [X] - JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, 36, (1991), FISCHER et al., "Experimental Device for Investigations of the Formation Process of the Ni(OH)2/NiOOH Electrode. Part II", pages 167-174. |