EP0788672 - ELECTRICAL CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/39] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | ||
Former [1997/33] | For all designated states THE WHITAKER CORPORATION 4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450 Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGENOLF, Bernhard Berliner Ring 28 D-63303 Dreieich / DE | 02 /
HOTEA, Gheorghe Am Felsenkeller 17 D-64347 Griesheim / DE | [1997/33] | Representative(s) | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion, et al Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/33] | Heinz-Schäfer, Marion, et al AMP International Enterprises Limited Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach (SG) / CH | Application number, filing date | 95932887.3 | 17.10.1995 | [1997/33] | WO1995IB00881 | Priority number, date | GB19940021358 | 24.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9421358 | [1997/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9613082 | Date: | 02.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788672 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788672 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/16, H01R13/11 | [1997/33] | CPC: |
H01R13/11 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49218 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/33] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES KONTAKTELEMENT | [1997/33] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONTACT | [1997/33] | French: | CONTACT ELECTRIQUE | [1997/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.09.1999 | IT | 29.09.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 29.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0608836 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * column 5, line 9 - line 34; figure 6 *; | [A]FR2703520 (FRANCELCO SA [FR]) [A] 1,5 * column 4, line 9 - line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]US4952178 (BEER DIETER [DE]) [A] 6-10 * column 3, line 2 - line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US5281175 (CHUPAK JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 5,10 * column 4, line 10 - line 19; figure 1 * |