EP0780024 - TORSIONAL TEXTURING OF SUPERCONDUCTING OXIDE COMPOSITE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN SUPERCONDUCTOR CORPORATION Two Technology Drive Westborough, MA 01581 / US | [1997/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTOPHERSON, Craig, John 21 Cross Street 36 Grafton, MA 01519 / US | 02 /
RILEY, Gilbert, N., Jr. 630 Hemenway Street Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
SCUDIERE, John 552 Wattaquadock Hill Road Bolton, MA 01752 / US | [1997/26] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/26] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | ||
Former [1997/26] | Harvey, David Gareth Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95933044.0 | 08.09.1995 | [1997/26] | WO1995US11269 | Priority number, date | US19940302601 | 08.09.1994 Original published format: US 302601 | [1997/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9608045 | Date: | 14.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0780024 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0780024 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [1997/26] | CPC: |
H10N60/0801 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/26] | Title | German: | TORSIONSTEXTURIEREN VON SUPRALEITENDEN OXYDVERBUNDGEGENSTÄNDEN | [1997/26] | English: | TORSIONAL TEXTURING OF SUPERCONDUCTING OXIDE COMPOSITE ARTICLES | [1997/26] | French: | TEXTURATION PAR TORSION D'ARTICLES COMPOSITES CONTENANT UN OXYDE SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [1997/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 19.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP0503525 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [PX]EP0638942 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) |