EP0787415 - MULTIPLE PULSE STIMULATION FOR COCHLEAR IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/32] | MULTIPLE PULSE STIMULATION | ||
[2001/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Melbourne Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MELBOURNE Grattan Street Parkville, Victoria 3052 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IRLICHT, Laurence 56 Lynch Crescent Brighton, VIC 3186 / AU | 02 /
CLARK, Graeme 13 Banoon Road Eltham, VIC 3095 / AU | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William Langner Parry 1-2 Bolt Court London EC4A 3DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 95933996.1 | 17.10.1995 | [1997/32] | WO1995AU00686 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM08837 | 17.10.1994 Original published format: AU PM883794 | [1997/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612383 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787415 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787415 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61F11/04 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/36039 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/49] |
Former [1997/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MEHRFACH-PULSSTIMULATION FÜR COCHLEARE-IMPLANTATE | [2001/12] | English: | MULTIPLE PULSE STIMULATION FOR COCHLEAR IMPLANTS | [2001/12] | French: | STIMULATION PAR IMPULSIONS MULTIPLES POUR DES IMPLANTS COCHLEAIRES | [2001/16] |
Former [1997/32] | MEHRFACH-PULSSTIMULATION | ||
Former [1997/32] | MULTIPLE PULSE STIMULATION | ||
Former [1997/32] | STIMULATION PAR IMPULSIONS MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4441202 (TONG YIT C [AU], et al) [X] 1-7,10-19,22-24 * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 55; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4532930 (CROSBY PETER A [AU], et al) [X] 1-7,10-19,22-24 * column 3, line 16 - line 49 * * column 8, line 17 - column 11, line 11 * * column 18, line 63 - column 19, line 9 * * column 25, line 60 - column 31, line 54 * * column 47, line 5 - column 49, line 68; figures 2,17 *; | [A] - DAWN BURTON KOCH ET AL, "A MULTIPEAK FEATURE EXTRACTION CODING STRATEGY FOR A MULTICHANNEL COCHLEAR IMPLANT", HEARING INSTRUMENTS, (19900301), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 28 - 29, 32, XP000142281 [A] 1-24 * figures 2,4 * | International search | [X]EP0054418 (COMMW OF AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [X]US4408608 (DALY CHRISTOPHER N [AU], et al); | [X]AU4681585 (UNIV MELBOURNE); | [X]US4593696 (HOCHMAIR INGEBORG J [AT], et al); | [X]WO9103913 (COCHLEAR PTY LTD [AU], et al) |