EP0800381 - PACIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alanen, Pentti Papinkatu 18 32200 Loimaa / FI | For all designated states Varrela, Juha Piispankatu 1, as. 6-7 20500 Turku / FI | [2004/19] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states Alanen, Pentti Papinkatu 18 32200 Loimaa / FI | ||
For all designated states Varrela, Juha 498 Glenlake Avenue Toronto Ontario M6P 1H1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/42] | Representative(s) | Heikkilä, Hannes Antero, et al Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Heikkilä, Hannes Antero, et al Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2002/20] | Furlong, Christopher Heinrich, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/42] | Öhman, Ann-Marie, et al Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy, P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 95934140.5 | 04.10.1995 | [1997/42] | WO1995FI00542 | Priority number, date | FI19940006191 | 30.12.1994 Original published format: FI 946191 | [1997/42] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9620687 | Date: | 11.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800381 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800381 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61J17/00 | [1997/42] | CPC: |
A61J17/001 (EP,US);
A61J17/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/42] | Title | German: | SCHNULLER | [1997/42] | English: | PACIFIER | [1997/42] | French: | SUCETTE | [1997/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.1997 | Translation filed | 17.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 31.07.2001 | Appeal received No. T0001/02 | 10.10.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.07.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.05.2004 | GR | 06.08.2004 | IE | 04.10.2004 | PT | 06.10.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/46] | BE | 06.05.2004 | |
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
IE | 04.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | BE | 06.05.2004 | |
GR | 06.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | GR | 06.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4993568 (MORIFUJI YASUO [JP], et al); | [X]US5035340 (TIMMONS SARAH J [US]); | [X]GB2278549 (PICK HERBERT [AT]) |