EP0735105 - NOVEL FLUORAN COMPOUND, INTERMEDIATE, AND CHROMOGENIC RECORDING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANAGITA, Mitsuhiro, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Takehiro, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 03 /
SUGA, Shigemi, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 04 /
HIDAKA, Tomoya, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 05 /
KAWABE, Toru, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem. 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 06 /
AIZAWA, Mamoru 192-305, Furukawa-cho, Hadazukashi, Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612 / JP | 07 /
SATO, Shinichi, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem., 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | 08 /
AOKI, Izuo, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. R & D Lab. for Spec. Chem., 12-54, Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934289.0 | 13.10.1995 | [1996/40] | WO1995JP02096 | Priority number, date | JP19940278496 | 18.10.1994 Original published format: JP 27849694 | JP19950049172 | 14.02.1995 Original published format: JP 4917295 | JP19950080693 | 13.03.1995 Original published format: JP 8069395 | [1996/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611986 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0735105 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B11/28, C07D493/10, B41M5/145, B41M5/30, C07C217/92, C09B11/24 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
C09B11/28 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/1455 (EP,US);
B41M5/3275 (EP,US);
C07C217/92 (EP,US);
C07D493/10 (EP,US);
C09B11/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/40] | C09B11/28, C07D493/10, B41M5/145, B41M5/30, C07C217/92 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | NEUE FLUORANVERBINDUNG, ZWISCHENVERBINDUNG UND CHROMOGENES AUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL | [1996/40] | English: | NOVEL FLUORAN COMPOUND, INTERMEDIATE, AND CHROMOGENIC RECORDING MATERIAL | [1996/40] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSE FLUORANE, INTERMEDIAIRE, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT CHROMOGENE | [1996/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1996 | Translation filed | 11.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 11.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/33] | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPS5018525 ; | [Y]JPS60255482 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD, et al); | [XY]JPS63156790 (SHIN NISSO KAKO CO LTD) |