EP0796319 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND IDENTIFYING MICROBIAL COLONIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAIER, Robert A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MORGAN, Scott D. P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1997/39] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/39] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95934444.1 | 20.09.1995 | [1997/39] | WO1995US11866 | Priority number, date | US19940356484 | 15.12.1994 Original published format: US 356484 | [1997/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9618720 | Date: | 20.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0796319 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0796319 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/34, C12Q1/04, C12Q1/06 | [1997/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/06 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
Y10S435/808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FESTSTELLEN UND/ODER ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON MIKROBENKOLONIEN | [1997/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING AND IDENTIFYING MICROBIAL COLONIES | [1997/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION ET D'IDENTIFICATION DE COLONIES MICROBIENNES ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [1997/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9426870 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-3,10-12; | [A]WO9401528 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3,10-12; | [A]US5270173 (YONEMORI FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,10-12 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 14; examples 1,3,6 * |