22.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
26.12.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
22.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
04.01.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
11.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.02.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
07.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.02.1998 |
First examination report |
|
16.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.12.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
20.09.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] |
03.09.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|