EP0740797 - METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFLAND, Lennart Auvergnelaan 22 NL-5627 ES Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
SAVORD, Bernard, Joseph 243 Highland Road Andover, MA 01810 / US | 03 /
SCAMPINI, Steven, Anthony 5 Redcoat Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 95934778.2 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/45] | WO1995IB00955 | Priority number, date | US19940345026 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: US 345026 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9616340 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740797 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740797 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/565 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/56563 (EP,US);
G01R33/5676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUR BILDERZEUGUNG MIT MAGNETISCHER RESONANZ | [1996/45] | English: | METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING | [1996/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE | [1996/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.02.2003 | NL | 19.02.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/41] | NL | 19.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9005920 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 8, line 16 - page 10, line 28 * * page 22, line 1 - page 25, line 11 * * page 27, line 4 - page 28, line 7 * * page 33, line 14 - page 38, line 14 *; | [D]US4937526 (EHMAN RICHARD L [US], et al); | [XA]EP0412819 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1 - line 41 * * page 3, line 47 - page 4, line 28 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 2,6; | [A]DE3918625 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 4 - line 52 * * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 57 *; | [D]US5042485 (SANO KOICHI [JP], et al) | [XA] - CH.J. HARDY ET AL.:, "Real-Time Acquisition, Display and Interactive Graphic Control of NMR Cardiac Profiles and Images", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, vol. 29, pages 667 - 673 [X] 1 * see pages 667 - 671, "Introduction", "Materials and Methods" and "Results" * * figures 3,4 * [A] 2,6 |