17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
05.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
31.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
31.05.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
22.02.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
14.12.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] |
08.06.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] |
20.03.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.01.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.07.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.10.1999 |
First examination report |
|
07.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.10.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.1997 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] |
18.10.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
23.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|