EP0782410 - FORWARD-FIRED AUTOMATIC TISSUE SAMPLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M3 SYSTEMS, INC., trading as MANAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS, INC. 2200 Carlson Drive Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states M3 SYSTEMS, INC., trading as MANAN MEDICAL PRODUCTS, INC. 2200 Carlson Drive Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRAMM, John B. 5218 Mulford Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 02 /
MITTERMEIER, Manfred 5448 W. Greenleaf Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 03 /
HABLE, Alan 4751 N. 25th Avenue Schiller Park, IL 60176 / US | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais 1202 Geneve / CH | Application number, filing date | 95935069.5 | 22.09.1995 | [1997/28] | WO1995US12138 | Priority number, date | US19940311507 | 23.09.1994 Original published format: US 311507 | [1997/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9609003 | Date: | 28.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782410 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782410 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/28] | Title | German: | VORWÄRTS AUSGERICHTETER AUTOMATISCHER GEWEBEPROBENAPPARAT | [1997/29] | English: | FORWARD-FIRED AUTOMATIC TISSUE SAMPLING APPARATUS | [1997/28] | French: | ECHANTILLONNEUR AUTOMATIQUE DE TISSUS, A PROJECTION VERS L'AVANT | [1997/28] |
Former [1997/28] | VORWÄRTSAUSGERICHTETERAUTOMATISCHERGEWEBEPROBENAPPARAT | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.1997 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.1997 | Search fee paid | 27.03.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 11.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.02.2003 | SE | 12.05.2003 | [2003/47] |
Former [2003/32] | SE | 12.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4958625 (BATES JAMES S [US], et al); | [A]US5224470 (SCHNEPP-PESCH WOLFRAM [DE], et al); | [A]US5284156 (SCHRAMM JOHN B [US], et al) | by applicant | SE8300112 | SE8600755 | CH483829 | US4699154 | EP0318447 | US4944308 | US4953558 | US5284156 | US5784156 | US19910753602 |