|
10.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2008 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
27.05.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Fax filed during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2007 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.02.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2006 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
65 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
20.10.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.1996 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.1996 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.1996 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |