05.12.2008 |
Opposition rejected |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
22.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
22.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
17.04.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.03.2008 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.03.2008 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
24.04.2007 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
16.02.2007 |
Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
04.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
01.09.2006 |
Opposition filed |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
14.10.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
29.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.05.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.01.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.09.1999 |
First examination report |
|
15.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.09.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
02.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
28.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|