Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3725095 | Global Dossier | 19.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US31501194 | 29.09.1994 | US9512244 | 25.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0731967 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2005 | B1 | EP0731967 | 18.09.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31501194 | 29.09.1994 | US9512244 | 25.09.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69534648T | 14.06.2006 | T2 | DE69534648D1 | 05.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US31501194 | 29.09.1994 | US9512244 | 25.09.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9610247 | Global Dossier | 04.04.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31501194 | 29.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5606622 | 25.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US31501194 | 29.09.1994 |