Designated contracting states | BE | | DE | | FR | | GB | | Examination procedure | 01.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | | 06.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 06.06.1996 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | European patent granted | 30.11.2005 | Opposition procedure | 24.07.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 18.09.1996 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE FR GB | | Event date: | 18.09.1996 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19960606 | | Event date: | 03.11.1999 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19990920 | | Event date: | 30.11.2005 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | BE DE FR GB | | Event date: | 30.11.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 05.01.2006 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69534648 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20060105 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 28.07.2006 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 04.10.2006 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | AIRBUS SAS/AIRBUS FRANCE/AIRBUS UK LIM AIRBUS DEUT | Effective DATE: | 20060824 | | Event date: | 07.01.2009 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Effective DATE: | 20080711 | | Event date: | 28.11.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20140917 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 28.11.2014 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20140929 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.01.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20140929 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 30.04.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20140929 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 25.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69534648 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Event date: | 14.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20150924 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20150924 | | Event date: | 14.10.2005 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 13.09.2005 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 31.05.2005 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 02.08.1996 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 05.12.2008 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED | | Event date: | 05.12.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009273 | | Event date: | 22.07.2008 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT OPPOSITION WAS REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREJ1 | | Event date: | 24.04.2007 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 16.02.2007 | | Event description: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Event date: | 04.10.2006 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 01.09.2006 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |