11.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
20.12.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] |
29.12.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] |
31.10.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.12.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.11.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] |
04.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.12.1997 |
First examination report |
|
10.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.05.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
30.05.1997 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
23.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.1997 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|