EP0783730 - NON-LINEAR CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SINGLE INPUT-SINGLE OUTPUT PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACKER, Paul, C. 4335 Goldenrod Lane Plymouth, MN 55422 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Gary, A. 4855 Evergreen Lane Plymouth, MN 55422 / US | [1997/29] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/52] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1997/29] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Honeywell Control Systems Limited, Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 95935244.4 | 28.09.1995 | [1997/29] | WO1995US12586 | Priority number, date | US19940315650 | 30.09.1994 Original published format: US 315650 | [1997/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9610779 | Date: | 11.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783730 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0783730 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02, G05D7/06 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
G05B13/0265 (EP,US);
G05D7/0635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/29] | Title | German: | NICHTLINEARES REGELUNGSSYSTEM FUR EINE ANLAGE MIT EINEM EINGANG UND EINEM AUSGANG | [1997/29] | English: | NON-LINEAR CONTROL SYSTEM FOR A SINGLE INPUT-SINGLE OUTPUT PROCESS | [1997/29] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE NON LINEAIRE POUR UN PROCEDE "ENTREE UNIQUE - SORTIE UNIQUE" | [1997/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4501125 (HAN DOYOUNG [US]) [X] 1,5-8,10-12 * column 6, line 37 - column 11, line 15; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2-4,9; | [X]US3333252 (SHIMABUKURO GEORGE T) [X] 1,6,8,10 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 30; figure 1A *; | [Y]JPH04116311 ; | [A]GB2192737 (TLV CO LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 55 - line 65 * * page 2, line 72 - page 3, line 83; figure 3 *; | [A]JPH03235900 ; | [A]JPH03137416 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920810), vol. 16, no. 370, Database accession no. (M - 1292), & JP4116311 A 19920416 (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL) [Y] 2-4,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920120), vol. 16, no. 21, Database accession no. (M - 1201), & JP3235900 A 19911021 (TOSHIBA) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910905), vol. 15, no. 350, Database accession no. (M - 1154), & JP3137416 A 19910612 (CHUGAI RO) [A] 3 * abstract * |