EP0787128 - SUBSTITUTED CYCLOALKYLAMINO AND CYCLOALKOXY HETEROCYCLES, PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/38] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Miraustr. 54 13509 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH Miraustrasse 54 13509 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄRKL, Martin Glauburgstrasse 85 D-60318 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
SCHAPER, Wolfgang Kapellenweg 5c D-86420 Diedorf / DE | 03 /
KNAUF, Werner Im Kirschgarten 24 D-65817 Eppstein / DE | 04 /
SANFT, Ulrich Burlachin Strasse 8 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | 05 /
KERN, Manfred Traminerweg 8 D-55296 Lörzweiler / DE | 06 /
BONIN, Werner Im Schulzehnten 18 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 07 /
LINKIES, Adolf, Heinz Textorstrasse 103 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | 08 /
REUSCHLING, Dieter, Bernd Beethovenstrasse 27 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | [1997/32] | Application number, filing date | 95935432.5 | 05.10.1995 | [1997/32] | WO1995EP03928 | Priority number, date | DE19944437137 | 18.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4437137 | [1997/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9611913 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787128 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D239/94, C07D239/88, C07D239/46, C07F7/08, A01N43/54 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D239/88 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
B27K3/343 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE CYCLOALKYLAMINO- UND -ALKOXY-HETEROCYCLEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL | [1997/32] | English: | SUBSTITUTED CYCLOALKYLAMINO AND CYCLOALKOXY HETEROCYCLES, PROCESS FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND THEIR USE AS PESTICIDES | [1997/32] | French: | HETEROCYCLES CYCLOALKYLAMINES ET CYCLOALCOXY, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME PESTICIDES | [1997/32] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/12] | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/12] | Request for further processing for: | 30.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0519211 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,8-20* page 32 - page 57; claim - *; | [DA]WO9319050 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DA] 1-3,12-19 * page 63; examples 228,1334; claim -; tables 1,14 * |