EP0790275 - PREFOAMED PARTICLES OF POLYPROPYLENE RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNAKATA, Yasumitsu 2-8 Motoyamanakamachi 4-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658 / JP | 02 /
SENDA, Kenichi 1-12, Korigaoka 6-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | [1997/40] |
Former [1997/34] | 01 /
MUNAKATA, Yasumitsu 13-13, Mishima 2-chome Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | ||
02 /
SENDA, Kenichi 1-12, Korigaoka 6-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95935584.3 | 27.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995JP02216 | Priority number, date | JP19940267509 | 31.10.1994 Original published format: JP 26750994 | [1997/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9613543 | Date: | 09.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0790275 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/16, C08K5/20, C08K5/3437 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
C08J9/16 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | C08J9/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1997/34] | Title | German: | VORGESCHÄUMTE PARTIKEL AUS POLYPROPYLENHARZ UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1997/34] | English: | PREFOAMED PARTICLES OF POLYPROPYLENE RESIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1997/34] | French: | PARTICULES PREMOUSSEES DE RESINE DE POLYPROPYLENE ET PROCEDE POUR LEUR FABRICATION | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1997 | Translation filed | 30.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 30.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 12.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/28] | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH047339 ; | [Y]EP0177961 (DANUBIA PETROCHEMIE [AT]) [Y] 1-13 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]EP0256489 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 8-13 * page 2, column 2, line 52 - page 5, column 1, line 43 *; | [XY]EP0492942 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * examples 17-30 * [Y] 8-13; | [DY]EP0557721 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 1-13 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 23 * * page 9, line 52 - page 10, line 9 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920415), vol. 016, no. 152, Database accession no. (C - 0929), & JP04007339 A 19920110 (TONEN CHEM CORP) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS58129028 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS612741 (JAPAN STYRENE PAPER CORP) |