04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
27.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |
30.03.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
07.04.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] |
03.03.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
11.12.1999 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
07.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.04.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.12.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.1998 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.12.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.03.1997 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] |
06.09.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] |
06.09.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.10.1996 [1996/43] |
27.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|