Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08126648 | Global Dossier | 21.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26936294 | 02.11.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3523712B | Global Dossier | 26.04.2004 | B2 | JPH08280701 | 29.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP8828195 | 13.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0738501 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2000 | B1 | EP0738501 | 07.05.1997 | A4 | EP0738501 | 23.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP26936294 | 02.11.1994 | JP8828195 | 13.04.1995 | JP9502244 | 02.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69517153T | 01.02.2001 | T2 | DE69517153D1 | 29.06.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP26936294 | 02.11.1994 | JP8828195 | 13.04.1995 | JP9502244 | 02.11.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5766184 | 16.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP26936294 | 02.11.1994 | JP8828195 | 13.04.1995 | JP9502244 | 02.11.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9614020 | Global Dossier | 17.05.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP26936294 | 02.11.1994 | JP8828195 | 13.04.1995 |