EP0738501 - ENDOSCOPE OPERATIVE INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNO, Kiyotaka Clair-Nishi-Hachiouji B302 4-16-13, Sanda-cho Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yukio 301 Tsuda-3-chome-Apartment No. 10 tou Tsuda-machi 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187 / JP | 03 /
SADAMASA, Akihito Olympus-Nishi-Hachiouji-Corporas No. 216 5-16-2, Sanda-cho Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 04 /
SHINOZUKA, Minoru 4-43-11, Sanda-cho Hachiouji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 05 /
YANUMA, Yutaka 4, Greenland Drive Huntington Station New York, NY 11746 / US | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Winter, Konrad Theodor Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei, Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Winter, Konrad Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kuhnen, Wacker & Partner Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936088.4 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/43] | WO1995JP02244 | Priority number, date | JP19940269362 | 02.11.1994 Original published format: JP 26936294 | JP19950088281 | 13.04.1995 Original published format: JP 8828195 | [1996/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614020 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738501 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738501 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/28, A61B17/32, A61B18/12, A61B10/00, A61B1/00 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B90/94 (EP,US);
A61B10/02 (EP,US);
A61B10/04 (EP);
A61B10/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/0643 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B18/1442 (EP,US);
A61B18/148 (EP,US);
A61B2010/045 (EP,US);
A61B2017/292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2931 (EP,US);
A61B2017/294 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2946 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0091 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00916 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1407 (EP,US);
A61B2018/141 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1425 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3782 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
A61B2218/003 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3289 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | A61B17/28, A61B17/32, A61B17/39, A61B10/00, A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/43] | Title | German: | MIT ENDOSKOP FUNKTIONIERENDES INSTRUMENT | [1996/43] | English: | ENDOSCOPE OPERATIVE INSTRUMENT | [1996/43] | French: | INSTRUMENT FONCTIONNANT AVEC UN ENDOSCOPE | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1996 | Translation filed | 24.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 30.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.05.2000 | IT | 24.05.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.05.2000 | |
Former [2001/24] | FR | 20.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4043323 (KOMIYA OSAMU) [Y] 12 * column 1, line 10 - line 31 *; | [XY]EP0027704 (CHAMNESS DALE L) [X] 1,20 * page 2, line 20 - line 29 * * page 9, line 7 - line 28 * [Y] 12,13; | [YA]WO9005491 (HILLWAY SURGICAL LTD [GB]) [Y] 13 * page 10 * [A] 2; | [X]US5066295 (KOZAK MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,20 * column 1, line 5 - line 7 ** column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 8 *; | [XA]WO9211815 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1,16,23 * page 24, line 19 - page 25, line 24; figures 1,5 * [A] 21,22 | International search | [Y]JPS63145641 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [X]JPH03195547 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) |