EP0740317 - LINE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORI, Tatsuya 4-408, Myokenzaka 5-chome Katano-shi Osaka 576 / JP | 02 /
MIYOSHI, Hisayo 2-26-8-302, Hoshigaoka Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Shunya 8-12-405, Ikedahigashi-machi Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572 / JP | 04 /
TOMITA, Hiroshi 22-13, Todacho 5-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570 / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936090.0 | 02.11.1995 | [1996/44] | WO1995JP02246 | Priority number, date | JP19940271300 | 04.11.1994 Original published format: JP 27130094 | JP19950058927 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: JP 5892795 | JP19950094864 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9486495 | JP19950094865 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9486595 | [1996/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614643 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0740317 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740317 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/26, H01F27/30, H01F27/33 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
H01F27/266 (EP,US);
H01F17/04 (EP,US);
H01F17/041 (EP,US);
H01F27/027 (EP,US);
H01F27/306 (EP,US);
H01F27/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/44] | H01F27/26, H01F27/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/44] | Title | German: | NETZFILTER | [1996/44] | English: | LINE FILTER | [1996/44] | French: | FILTRE DE LIGNE | [1996/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1996 | Translation filed | 24.06.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.06.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99118603.2 / EP0962947 | EP99118612.3 / EP0962948 | EP99118640.4 / EP0978851 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR1180873 (AMERICAN MACH & FOUNDRY) [Y] 1,3 * page 2A2, column R, line 19 - line 35; figures 1,6 * [A] 16,20; | [YA]US4779068 (SAKAMOTO YUKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 1, line 9 - line 23; figure 1 * [A] 16,20; | [A]DE9104253U (WEINER) [A] 1,3,16,20 * page 3, line 1 - line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0615260 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO INC [JP]) [A] 1,3,16,20* abstract * | International search | [A]JPS61205013U ; | [A]JPH02127018U ; | [A]JPH0325218U ; | [A]JPH0463113U ; | [A]JPH0499516U |