EP0791174 - PARTICLE PROPERTY MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLINGS, Anthony, Francis 5 Robin Avenue Turramurra, NSW 2074 / AU | 02 /
BAJENOV, Nicholas 14 Halcyon Avenue Wahroonga, NSW 2076 / AU | 03 /
CUSACK, Peter, John 10 Colah Road Mount Colah, NSW 2079 / AU | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95936380.5 | 09.11.1995 | [1997/35] | WO1995AU00747 | Priority number, date | AU1994PM09349 | 09.11.1994 Original published format: AU PM934994 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615446 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0791174 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/02, G01N29/20 | [2002/30] | CPC: |
G01N29/032 (EP,US);
G01N2291/015 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02416 (EP,US);
G01N2291/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/35] | G01N29/02, A61M5/178 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/35] | Title | German: | MESSUNG DER EIGENSCHAFTEN VON TEILCHEN | [1997/35] | English: | PARTICLE PROPERTY MEASUREMENT | [1997/35] | French: | MESURE DE PROPRIETES DE PARTICULES | [1997/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.1997 | Search fee paid | 30.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 30.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 10.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4706509 (RIEBEL ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-14,16-18 * abstract *; column 2, line 17 - line 23 * * column 2, line 49 - line 54 *; | [A] - ALIG I ET AL, "Ultrasonic spectroscopy for measurement of phase velocity and attenuation at high frequencies in polymer systems", ACUSTICA, JULY 1992, GERMANY, vol. 76, no. 6, ISSN 0001-7884, pages 273 - 282, XP001071150 [A] 1-14,16-18 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * page 273 - page 275 * * formula (3), page 274 * | [A] - EGGERS F ET AL, "Ultrasonic absorption measurements in liquids above 100 MHz with continuous waves, employing algebraic crosstalk elimination", ACUSTICA, FEB. 1993, GERMANY, vol. 78, no. 1, ISSN 0001-7884, pages 27 - 35, XP001080309 [A] 1-14,16-18 * page 28, column R, paragraph 4 * * abstract * | [T] - KAATZE U ET AL, "Acoustic relaxation spectrometers for liquids", ULTRASONICS, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS LTD. GUILDFORD, GB, (200110), vol. 39, no. 6, ISSN 0041-624X, pages 393 - 406, XP004324321 [T] 1-14,16-18 * abstract * * page 398, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 405, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0041-624X(01)00078-6 | [A] - COLLINGS A F ET AL, "Ultrasonic determination of erythrocyte deformability", AUSTRALASIAN PHYSICAL & ENGINEERING SCIENCES IN MEDICINE, JULY-SEPT. 1982, AUSTRALIA, vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0158-9938, pages 98 - 101, XP001080291 [A] 1-14,16-18 *formula (2) *; page 1; figures 1,5 * | International search | [Y]US3779070 (ANDERSON V, et al); | [X]US4202215 (MEYER CHARLES R [US]); | [X]AU9175782 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG); | [X]US4414850 (MIWA HIROHIDE [JP], et al); | [X]US4509524 (MIWA HIROHIDE [JP]); | [X]US4594896 (CARDOSO JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | [X]US4688428 (NICOLAS JEAN-MARIE [FR]); | [X]US4750366 (NICOLAS JEAN-MARIE [FR]); | [X]WO9107646 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]WO9316640 (WEISSGERBER RUDOLPH E [DE], et al); | [Y]FR2707112 (FABRE PIERRE COSMETIQUE [FR]) |