EP0789532 - SAMPLE-TAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLOTH, Bernd Müssenredder 8 22399 Hamburg / DE | [1997/45] |
Former [1997/39] | For all designated states KLOTH, Bernd Ewige Weide 7 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states KLOTH, Bernd Müssenredder 8 D-22399 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Gerbaulet, Hannes Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936575.0 | 31.10.1995 | [1997/34] | WO1995EP04269 | Priority number, date | DE19940017612U | 03.11.1994 Original published format: DE 9417612 U | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9614017 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0789532 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0789532 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14, B01L3/00 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150343 (EP,US);
G01N33/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/34] | Extension states | LT | 22.05.1997 | LV | 22.05.1997 | SI | 22.05.1997 | Title | German: | PROBENABNAHMEGERÄT | [1997/34] | English: | SAMPLE-TAKING DEVICE | [1997/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS | [1997/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6378043 ; | [A]DE2558311 (BECTON DICKINSON CO) [A] 3-5,10 * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 25; figures 1-4 *; | [XAY]WO7901131 (TURNER R, et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,18 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 7 * * page 7, line 22 - line 29 * * page 9, line 29 - page 11, line 25; figure - * [A] 16 [Y] 6,7,11,13,14; | [YA]EP0421175 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 6,7,11,13,14 * page 5, line 7 - line 54; figures 5-8 * [A] 3,18,21 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880822), vol. 12, no. 307, Database accession no. (P - 747), & JP63078043 A 19880408 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * |