EP0744046 - INTELLIGENT SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AND EXECUTING A SHEET METAL BENDING PLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | For all designated states U.S. AMADA LTD. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park California 90621 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY, LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states U.S. AMADA LTD. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park, California 90621 / US | |||
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states AMADA COMPANY LIMITED 200 Ishida Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-11 / JP | ||
For all designated states U.S. AMADA LTD. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park, California 90621 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURNE, David, Alan 209 Kearsarge Street Pittsburgh, PA 15211 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Duane, Thomas 6514 Bartlett Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217-1834 / US | 03 /
KIM, Kyoung, Hung Apartment B-5 5641 Hobart Street Pittsburgh, PA 15217 / US | 04 /
KRISHNAN, Sivaraj, Sivarama III Block 515, 15th Main Koramangala Bangalore 560034 / IN | 05 /
HAZAMA, Kensuke U.S. Amada, Ltd. 7025 Firestone Boulevard Buena Park, CA 90621 / US | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936762.4 | 09.11.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995JP02291 | Priority number, date | US19940338113 | 09.11.1994 Original published format: US 338113 | US19950386369 | 09.02.1995 Original published format: US 386369 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9615481 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744046 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744046 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4099, G05B19/4155, B21D5/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B21D5/02 (EP,US);
G05B19/4069 (EP,US);
G05B19/4097 (EP,US);
G05B19/41825 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31352 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35189 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39105 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39467 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [1996/48] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND AUSFÜHRUNG EINES METALLPLATTENBIEGEPLANS | [1996/48] | English: | INTELLIGENT SYSTEM FOR GENERATING AND EXECUTING A SHEET METAL BENDING PLAN | [1996/48] | French: | SYSTEME INTELLIGENT SERVANT A GENERER ET A EXECUTER UN PLAN DE PLIAGE DE TOLES METALLIQUES | [1996/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 02.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 12.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 18.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02002809.8 / EP1253496 | EP06002177.1 / EP1657607 | EP06009075.0 / EP1684140 | EP06009079.2 / EP1681607 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5307282 (CONRADSON SCOTT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-43,55-65 * column 13, lines 18-24 * * column 2, lines 17-26 * * column 2, lines 47-59 * * column 5, lines 30-35 * * column 6, lines 35-39 * * column 8, lines 5-8 * * column 8, lines 19-22 * * column 8, lines 51-56 * * column 13, lines 56-61 *; | [Y]US5005394 (SARTORIO FRANCO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-43 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0355454 (BOEING CO [US]) [Y] 4,24,27,44-48 * page 14, line 37 - page 15, line 24 *; | [Y]US5058406 (SARTORIO FRANCO [IT], et al) [Y] 66 * claim 9 *; | [Y]EP0301527 (UNIV BRIGHAM YOUNG [US]) [Y] 66 * page 8, lines 17-19 * | [XY] - WEULE H ET AL, "RECHNERINTEGRIERTE FERTIGUNG VON ABKANTTEILEN", VDI Z, (198809), vol. 130, no. 9, pages 101 - 106, XP000027002 [X] 40-43,52-54 * figure 2 * [Y] 19-21 | [YA] - REISSNER J, "INNOVATIONSSCHUB BEI RECHNERINTEGRIERTEN UMFORMSYSTEMEN", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, (19930205), vol. 85, no. 5, pages 20 - 25, XP000342593 [Y] 28-35,44-48 * Page 24, section "Automatisierte flexible Blechbearbeitungszelle";; figure 8 * [A] 49-51 | [Y] - GEIGER M ET AL, INFERENZMASCHINE FUER EIN BIEGESTADIENPLANUNGSSYSTEM, ZWF ZEITSCHRIFT FUR WIRTSCHAFTLICHE FERTIGUNG UND AUTOMATISIERUNG, VOL. 87, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 261 - 264, (19920501), XP000271922 [Y] 6 * page 261, column R * * Section "Verarbeitung der Bewertungskriterien nach graphentheoretischen Grundlagen" * | [Y] - COMMUNIGRAPHICS INC, "LVD Introduces new CNC/DNC/CAD/CAM control system for press brakes at IMTS '86", DIALOG, Information Access Co, XP002010528 [Y] 1,5,7-16,22,23,55-65 * the whole document * | [Y] - COMMUNIGRAPHICS INC, "LVD intorduces new CNC/DNC/CAD/CAM control system for press brakes at IMTS '86", NEW PRODUCT ANNOUCEMENTS, PLAINVILLE, CT, USA, (198607), no. 0134529 [Y] 1,5,7-16,22,23,55-65 * the whole document * |