EP0793625 - PORTLAND CEMENT CLINKER AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | Change - designated states | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Odler, Ivan 22 Frederic Street Newton, MA 02160 / US | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95936947.1 | 17.11.1995 | [1997/37] | WO1995DE01621 | Priority number, date | DE19944441614 | 23.11.1994 Original published format: DE 4441614 | [1997/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615996 | Date: | 30.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793625 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C04B7/04 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
C04B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1997/37] | Title | German: | PORTLANDZEMENTKLINKER UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [1997/37] | English: | PORTLAND CEMENT CLINKER AND USE THEREOF | [1997/37] | French: | CLINKER DE CIMENT PORTLAND ET SON UTILISATION | [1997/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 22.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/50] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4036657 (MEHTA POVINDAR K) [A] 1,3,4,9-11 * column W *; | [A]US4042408 (MURRAY RANSOM JAMES, et al) [A] 1,3,4,9,10 * claims 1-30 * * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 26 *; | [DX]DE4204227 (ODLER I) [DX] 1-4,6,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9321122 (AALBORG PORTLAND AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-4,7,9-11 * claims 1,6,7,19,26-28 * * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 10 ** page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 7 * | [A] - GIMENEZ S. & AL., "Production of cement requiring low energy expenditure - An industrial test", ZEMENT, KALK, GIPS, WIESBADEN DE, no. 1, pages 12 - 15 |