EP0799441 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING TECHNICAL PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLEDNA, Stefan Untere Augartenstrasse 36/17 A-1020 Wien / AT | [1997/41] | Application number, filing date | 95936982.8 | 25.11.1995 | [1997/41] | WO1995DE01665 | Priority number, date | DE19944445651 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4445651 | [1997/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9619759 | Date: | 27.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0799441 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0799441 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2241 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25347 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25411 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON TECHNISCHEN VORGÄNGEN | [1997/41] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING TECHNICAL PROCESSES | [1997/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS TECHNIQUES | [1997/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 20.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2119124 (VGL IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 99 - page 3, line 98; figure 3 *; | [A]JPH04302026 ; | [A]EP0362971 (MEASUREX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 15 * * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930310), vol. 017, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 1499), & JP04302026 A 19921026 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |