EP0795059 - A METHOD OF PROVIDING A ROAD SURFACE WITH AN OVERLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esha Holding B.V. Hoendiep 316 9744 TC Groningen / NL | [1998/38] |
Former [1997/38] | For all designated states Vejtek International A/S Bystaevnevej 4 5750 Ringe / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOVE, Leo Bystaevnevej 4 DK-5750 Ringe / DK | [1997/38] | Representative(s) | Kruk, Wiggert Johan, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [1998/24] |
Former [1997/38] | Skoett-Jensen, Knud K. Skoett-Jensen Patentingenioerer A/S Lemmingvej 225 8361 Hasselager / DK | Application number, filing date | 95937001.6 | 28.11.1995 | [1997/38] | WO1995DK00478 | Priority number, date | DK19940001356 | 28.11.1994 Original published format: DK 135694 | [1997/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9617130 | Date: | 06.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0795059 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0795059 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E01C7/35, E01C7/18 | [1997/38] | CPC: |
E01C7/08 (EP);
E01C7/18 (EP);
E01C7/351 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, GR, LU, NL [1997/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESCHICHTUNG EINER STRASSENFLÄCHE | [1997/38] | English: | A METHOD OF PROVIDING A ROAD SURFACE WITH AN OVERLAY | [1997/38] | French: | TECHNIQUE DE REVETEMENT D'UNE CHAUSSEE AU MOYEN D'UN TAPIS D'ENROBES | [1997/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/38] | 14.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0127470 ; | [A]US3797951 ; | [A]US2220149 ; | [A]US2147195 |