EP0754266 - SPLIT STREAM BOILER FOR COMBINED CYCLE POWER PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICE, Ivan G. 1007 Lynwood P.O. Box 233 Spring, TX 77373 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states RICE, Ivan G. 1007 Lynwood P.O. Box 233 Spring, TX 77373 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [1997/04] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page & Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95937318.4 | 11.10.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US12659 | Priority number, date | US19940320956 | 12.10.1994 Original published format: US 320956 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612091 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754266 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10, F01K21/04 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
F01K21/042 (EP,US);
F01K23/103 (EP,US);
F22B1/1815 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | KOMBIKRAFTWERK MIT AUFGETEILTER STRÖMUNG IM KESSEL | [1997/04] | English: | SPLIT STREAM BOILER FOR COMBINED CYCLE POWER PLANTS | [1997/04] | French: | CHAUDIERE A COURANT DIVISE POUR CENTRALES DE PRODUCTION D'ENERGIE A CYCLE COMBINE | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/50] | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.1996 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 | 29.08.1996 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.09.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2143589 (DBA PARGA) [X] 1-3,16,17 * page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 9; figure - *; | [X]CH429311 (PAUKER FRANZ DIPL ING [AT]) [X] 1-3,16 * column 11, line 11 - line 55; figure 7 *; | [X]US4852344 (WARNER DONALD F [US]) [X] 1,2,16 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 5; figure - *; | [X]BE857109 (SULZER AG) [X] 1,2,16,25 * page 3, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [X]DE3815993 (WIESER DR RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 25 * column 5, line 23 - line 44; figure 4 *; | [A]DE3815536 (WOLFF WALSRODE); | [A]US5267434 (TERMUEHLEN HEINZ [US], et al) | [A] - F.NANDJEE AND M.ROCHE, "Nouveaux cycles de turbines à gaz au méthanol", REVUE GENERALE DE THERMIQUE, PARIS FR, vol. 25, no. 289, pages 19 - 26 [A] 28 * page 21, column L, line 10 - line 17; figure 4 * |