EP0839263 - COMPRESSION RELEASE ENGINE BRAKES WITH ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED, MULTI-COIL HYDRAULIC VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diesel Engine Retarders, Inc. Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states DIESEL ENGINE RETARDERS, INC. Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Haoran 37 Paper Chase Drive Farmington, CT 06032 / US | 02 /
KONOPKA, John, A. 27 Pierce Street Feeding Hills, MA 01030 / US | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95937473.7 | 04.10.1995 | [1998/19] | WO1995US13279 | Priority number, date | US19940319734 | 07.10.1994 Original published format: US 319734 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9611327 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0839263 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0839263 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/06 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
F01L13/06 (EP,US);
F02D13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/19] | Title | German: | KOMPRESSIONSVERRINGERUNGSMOTORBREMSEN MIT ELEKTRONISCH GESTEUERTEN MULTISPULEN HYDRAULIKVENTILEN | [1998/19] | English: | COMPRESSION RELEASE ENGINE BRAKES WITH ELECTRONICALLY CONTROLLED, MULTI-COIL HYDRAULIC VALVES | [1998/19] | French: | FREIN-MOTEUR A DECOMPRESSION DOTE D'UNE SOUPAPE HYDRAULIQUE MULTI-BOBINES A COMMANDE ELECTRONIQUE | [1998/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1997 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.04.1997 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 08.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3743898 (STURMAN ODED EDDIE [US]) [A] 4,5 * column W *; | [A]US4898128 (MENEELY VINCENT A [CA]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4976227 (DRAPER DAVID J [US]) [A] 15* figure -; claim - *; | [YD]US5012778 (PITZI VINCENT J [US]) [YD] 1,2,4,9-11 * column W *; | [Y]US5253619 (RICHESON WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9-11 * column W *; | [A]US5335633 (THIEN JAMES L [US]) [A] 1 * column W * |