EP0784466 - USE AND COMPOSITION OF AN ANTI-SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Columbia Laboratories (Bermuda) Limited Rosebank Center, 14 Bermudiana Road Pembroke HM08 / BM | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states Columbia Laboratories (Bermuda) Limited Rosebank Center, 14 Bermudiana Road Pembroke HM08 / BM | ||
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states COLUMBIA LABORATORIES, INC. Suite PH-II-B, 2665 South Bayshore Drive Coconut Grove, FL 33133 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLOGNA, William Joseph 501 East 79th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
LEVINE, Howard Leslie 15 Franklin Place Oceanside, NY 11572 / US | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95937526.2 | 06.10.1995 | [1997/30] | WO1995US13424 | Priority number, date | US19940319495 | 07.10.1994 Original published format: US 319495 | [1997/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9610989 | Date: | 18.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784466 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0784466 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K47/32 | [1997/30] | CPC: |
A61K9/0034 (EP,US);
A61K9/00 (KR);
A61K47/32 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
Y10S424/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/30] | Extension states | LT | 02.05.1997 | LV | 02.05.1997 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG VOM ARZNEIMITTELN GEGEN GESCHECHTLICH ÜBERTRAGBARE KRANKHEITEN | [1997/30] | English: | USE AND COMPOSITION OF AN ANTI-SEXUALLY TRANSMITTED DISEASES FORMULATION | [1997/30] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UNE FORMULATION AGISSANT CONTRE LES MALADIES SEXUELLEMENT TRANSMISSIBLES ET SON UTILISATION | [1997/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/30] | 16.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0077063 (EXOVIR INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5,8,10,12 * claims 1,6,9,10 * * page 1, line 31 - line 38 * * page 15, line 18 * * page 16, line 5 - line 16 *; | [A]EP0351301 (SSPL SA SAFE SEX PROD LICENS [FR]) [A] 1,5,8,12,19 * column W *; | [A]EP0385030 (LEVEEN HARRY H [US], et al) [A] 1,5,8,10,12,19* claims 1,3,4,7 *; | [AD]WO9106283 (COLUMBIA LAB INC [US]) [AD] 1,2,5,19 * claim - * |