EP0786146 - WAFER TRANSFER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. P.O. Box 7010 Kalispell Montana 59904 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | For all designated states SEMITOOL, INC. P.O. Box 7010 Kalispell, Montana 59904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Steve P.O. Box 7010 Kalispell, MT 59904 / US | 02 /
LaBERE, Rikki, S. P.O. Box 7010 Kalispell, MT 59904 / US | [1997/31] | Representative(s) | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/31] | Pratt, David Martin, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95938154.2 | 13.10.1995 | [1997/31] | WO1995US12769 | Priority number, date | US19940322754 | 13.10.1994 Original published format: US 322754 | [1997/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9612294 | Date: | 25.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0786146 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1997/31] | CPC: |
H01L21/67781 (EP,US);
Y10S414/137 (EP,US);
Y10S414/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/11] |
Former [1997/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WAFER-TRANSFER-APPARAT | [1997/31] | English: | WAFER TRANSFER APPARATUS | [1997/31] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRANSFERT DE PLAQUETTES DE SILICIUM | [1997/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 14.05.1997 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.1997 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | LI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.1997 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2624839 (RECIF SA [FR]) [A] 1,10,19,28,36,40,44,48* page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0445651 (TET TECHNO INVESTMENT TRUST [LI]) [X] 1-7,9,36-39,44-47 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 40; figures 3A-3C *; | [A]WO9419821 (MAYER HERBERT E [LI]) [A] 1-9,36-39,44-47 * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 1; figures 7-9C * |