EP0804750 - LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND ALIGNMENT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEO-CENTERS, INC. 7 Wells Avenue Newton Centre Massachusetts 02159 / US | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES, represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE NAVY Washington, DC 20350 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states GEO-CENTERS, INC. 7 Wells Avenue Newton Centre, Massachusetts 02159 / US | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES, represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE NAVY Washington, DC 20350 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHASHIDHAR, Ranganathan 8928 Applecross Lane Springfield, VA 22153 / US | 02 /
PEEK, Brian 4527 Casablanca Court Annandale, VA 22203 / US | 03 /
RATNA, Banahalli, R. 8928 Applecross Lane Springfield, VA 22153 / US | 04 /
CALVERT, Jeffrey, M. 9102 Peartree Landing Alexandria, VA 22309 / US | 05 /
SCHNUR, Joel, M. 6009 Lincolnwood Court Burke, VA 22105 / US | 06 /
CHEN, Mu-San 10181 Maxine Street Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | 07 /
CRAWFORD, Renate, J. 2226 William & Mary Drive Alexandria, VA 22308 / US | [1997/45] | Representative(s) | Sulzbach, Werner Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/45] | Sulzbach, Werner, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95938710.1 | 24.10.1995 | [1997/45] | WO1995US12747 | Priority number, date | US19950375997 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375997 | [1997/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622561 | Date: | 25.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0804750 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/133719 (EP,US);
G02F1/1337 (KR);
C09K2323/023 (EP,US);
G02F1/133753 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/45] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKRISTALLZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ORIENTIERUNGSSCHICHT | [1997/45] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL COMPOSITION AND ALIGNMENT LAYER | [1997/45] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ET COUCHE D'ALIGNEMENT | [1997/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1997 | Search fee paid | 16.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/45] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2002 | 31.10.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2003 | 31.10.2006 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0476543 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,9,10,15,16 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 26 * * page 4, line 5 - line 25 * * figures 1A,1B; claims 1,10,16 *; | [A]DE2604293 (BANNIKOV) [A] 1,2,9-11 * example 6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0601895 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0612755 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0312100 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 22 - line 30 * | [X] - KAZUFUMI OGAWA ET AL, "CONTROL OF PRETILT ANGLES OF LIQUID CRYSTAL MOLECULES IN A LIQUID CRYSTAL CELL USING A CHEMICALLY ADSORBED MONOLAYER AS AN ALIGNMENT FILM", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19900901), vol. 29, no. 9 PART 02, pages L1689 - L1692, XP000164688 [X] 1,2,9,10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4974941 (GIBBONS WAYNE M [US], et al); | [A]US5032009 (GIBBONS WAYNE M [US], et al) |