EP0792442 - NON-DESTRUCTIVE IDENTIFICATION OF TABLET AND TABLET DISSOLUTION BY MEANS OF INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soloman, Sabrie 31 North Monroe Street Ridgewood, NJ 07450 / US | [1997/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939085.7 | 07.11.1995 | [1997/36] | WO1995US14455 | Priority number, date | US19940338909 | 14.11.1994 Original published format: US 338909 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9615428 | Date: | 23.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0792442 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.05.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/00, G01J5/08, G01J5/18, G01N21/35, G01N33/15 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
G01N21/3563 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/36] | G01J3/00, G01J5/08, G01J5/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/36] | Title | German: | NICHT ZERSTÖRENDES VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION VON TABLETTEN UND TABLETTENLÖSUNGEN MITTELS INFRAROTSPEKTROSKOPIE | [1997/36] | English: | NON-DESTRUCTIVE IDENTIFICATION OF TABLET AND TABLET DISSOLUTION BY MEANS OF INFRARED SPECTROSCOPY ANALYSIS | [1997/36] | French: | IDENTIFICATION NON DESTRUCTIVE ET DISSOLUTION DE COMPRIMES PAR ANALYSE SPECTROSCOPIQUE AUX INFRAROUGES | [1997/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1997 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1997 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.06.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 31.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 03.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1998 | 30.11.2000 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3029945 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN [DE]) [A] 18-21 * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO8911642 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [A] 1* claim - *; | [A]EP0522988 (ANJOU RECH [FR]) [A] 18-21 * page 3, line 40 - line 45 * * page 5, line 9 - line 13 *; | [X]EP0548582 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 19,21 * page 3, line 41 - line 51 * | International search | [A]US4384206 (BJARNO OLE-CHRISTIAN [DK]); | [A]US4980292 (ELBERT LAWRENCE E [US], et al); | [A]US5089701 (DULL GERALD G [US], et al); | [A]US5262644 (MAGUIRE JOHN F [US]) |