EP0790778 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STEAM PASTEURIZATION OF MEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frigoscandia Inc. 14949 N.E. 40th Street Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [1997/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Robert, C. 7551 205th Avenue N.E. Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 02 /
LEISING, Jerome, D. 19870 Waterford Place Shorewood, MN 55331 / US | 03 /
STRONG, John 10603 N.E. 110th Street Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 04 /
HOCKER, Jon 20024 99th Court N.E. Bothell, WA 98011 / US | 05 /
O'CONNOR, Jerry 2625 233rd Avenue S.E. Issaquah, WA 98027 / US | [1997/35] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/35] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 95939090.7 | 06.11.1995 | [1997/35] | WO1995US14467 | Priority number, date | US19940335437 | 07.11.1994 Original published format: US 335437 | [1997/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9613983 | Date: | 17.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790778 | Date: | 27.08.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.05.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790778 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A23B4/005 | [1997/35] | CPC: |
A22B5/0082 (EP,US);
A23B4/00 (EP,US);
A23B4/0053 (EP,US);
A23B4/0056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/35] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VERFAHREN ZUM DAMPFPASTEURISIREN VON FLEISCH | [1999/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR STEAM PASTEURIZATION OF MEAT | [1997/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PASTEURISATION DE VIANDE A LA VAPEUR | [1997/35] |
Former [1997/35] | Methode und Verfahren zum Dampfpasteurisiren von Fleisch | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1997 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 22.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.1999 | BE | 28.04.1999 | GR | 28.04.1999 | NL | 28.04.1999 | DK | 28.07.1999 | PT | 30.07.1999 | LU | 06.11.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
GR | 28.04.1999 | ||
NL | 28.04.1999 | ||
DK | 28.07.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
CH | 28.04.1999 | ||
GR | 28.04.1999 | ||
LI | 28.04.1999 | ||
NL | 28.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
MC | 30.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
CH | 28.04.1999 | ||
GR | 28.04.1999 | ||
LI | 28.04.1999 | ||
NL | 28.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
Former [2001/32] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
CH | 28.04.1999 | ||
GR | 28.04.1999 | ||
LI | 28.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
GR | 28.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
PT | 30.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 28.04.1999 | |
BE | 28.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 28.04.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB191423666 (HURTLEY WILLIAM HOLDSWORTH [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB954391 (ARMOUR & CO); | [A]FR1486467 (P. SAGET ET AL.); | [A]US3705813 (VOGEL PAUL W, et al); | [A]DE2651173 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE); | [X]US4255459 (GLEN DONALD H G) [X] 1-3,7,11,14,15,17 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 34 * * column 5, lines 48-54; figure -; claim - * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 49 * * column 7, line 53 - column 8, line 9 *; | [Y]FR2497072 (THIMON ETS [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13-17,19,20,3,5 * page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 37 * * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 23; figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2240912 (G W PADLEY [GB]) [A] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2663509 (COMAZZI [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13-17,19,20 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 16; figure -; claim - * * page 2, line 25 - page 4, line 4 *; | [YP]US5439694 (MORRIS JR WILLIAM F [US]) [YP] 3,5 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 7 * |